1 |
Vice-Chancellor, VIT Bhopal University, Sehore, Madhya Pradesh, India |
Since 19th July, 2017 |
2 |
Pro Vice-Chancellor, VIT University Chennai Campus, Chennai, Tamil Nadu, India |
4 Jan, 2016 - 18 July, 2017 |
3 |
Vice-Chancellor, Thiruvalluvar University, Vellore, Tamil Nadu, India |
23 July, 2012 - 22 July, 2015 |
4 |
Government nominee to search committee for appointment of Vice-Chancellor to Annamalai Universirty, Chidembaram, Tamil Nadu, India |
2015 |
5 |
Government nominee to search committee for appointment of Vice-Chancellor to Tamil Nadu Open University, Chennai, Tamil Nadu, India |
2016 |
6 |
Chairman, Search committee for appointment of Vice-Chancellor, Vels University, Chennai, Tamil Nadu, India |
2017 |
7 |
Member (appointed by Chancellor), to Planning Board of Bharathiar University, Coimbatore, Tamil Nadu, India |
2017 |
8 |
Chancellor nominee to selection committee in Periyar University, Tamil Nadu, India |
2012 - 2015 |
9 |
Chancellor nominee to selection committee in Tamil Nadu Teacher Education University, Tamil Nadu, India |
2013 - 2016 |
10 |
Chairman’s nominee to selection committee in Tamil Nadu Science Centre, Tamil Nadu, India |
2015 |
11 |
Member, Syndicate Committee to look after University administration in absence of Vice-Chancellor |
April 2011 - March 2012 |
12 |
Convener, Syndicate committee to look after University administration in absence of Vice-Chancellor |
4 - 9, April, 2011 |
13 |
Member, DST- PURSE Program Working Committee |
June 2011 - June 2012 |
14 |
Member, Syndicate, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India (nominated by His Excellency, The Chancellor of Tamil Nadu, India) |
2010 - 2013 |
15 |
Member, Syndicate, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India (elected from Senate, MKU, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India) |
2004 - 2007 |
16 |
Special Officer (SO), Planning and Development, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India |
2007 - 2010 |
17 |
Special Officer - Additional Charge, Planning and Development, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India |
October 2011 - June 2012 |
18 |
Member, Senate, Alagappa University, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India (nominated by His Excellency, The Chancellor of Tamil Nadu, India) |
2008 - 2011 |
19 |
Member, Selection committee for appointments in Periyar University (nominated by His Excellency, The Chancellor of Tamil Nadu, India) |
2011 - 2013 |
20 |
Member, Selection committee for appointments in Tamil Nadu Teachers Education University, Chennai, Tamil Nadu, India (nominated by His Exceelency, The chancellor of Tamil Nadu, India) |
2013 - 2015 |
21 |
Member, Academic Standby Committee, Bharathidasan University, Thiruchirapalli, Tamil Nadu, India |
2007 - 2008 |
22 |
Member, Finance Committee, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India |
2004 - 2007 & 2010 - 2013 |
23 |
Convener, Purchase Committee, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India |
2010 - July 2012 |
24 |
Convener, Accounts, Audit Committee, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai |
2010 - July 2012 |
25 |
Coordinator, UPE Review Committee Meeting, Madurai Kamaraj University |
13 – 15 December 2010 |
26 |
Coordinator, UGC XI Plans Visiting Committee Meeting, Madurai Kamaraj University |
June 2008 |
27 |
Member, Research Committee, Madurai Kamaraj University |
2004 - 2007 |
28 |
Member, Building Committee, Madurai Kamaraj University |
2004 – 2007 & 2010 – 2011 |
29 |
Chairperson, School of Biological Sciences, Madurai Kamaraj University |
2008 – 2010 |
30 |
Coordinator, University with Potential for Excellence (UPE), Madurai Kamaraj University |
October 2010 - June 2012 |
31 |
Coordinator, UGC Centre for Excellence in Genomic Sciences (CEGS) Programme |
2002 - June 2012 |
32 |
Coordinator, UGC Networking Resource Centre in Biological Sciences (NRCBS) Programme |
2008 - June 2012 |
33 |
Coordinator, DBT Integrated Programme in Life Sciences (IPLS) for Advanced Research and Education |
2010 - June 2012 |
34 |
Coordinator, Fund for Improvement of S&T Infrastructure in Higher Educational Institutions (DST FIST – Level II) |
2009 - June 2012 |
35 |
Coordinator, MHRD Centre for Excellence in Biomedical Sciences Programme |
2011 - June 2012 |
36 |
Member, Steering Committee, UPE, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India |
2010 - June 2012 |
37 |
Member, UGC expert committee for the evaluation of Major Research Projects |
2009 - June 2012 |
38 |
Member, Expert Committee – Assessment of University with Potential for Excellence (UPE) scheme in NEHU, Shillong, India |
2011 |
39 |
Member, Selection Committee for Appointment of Principals in several Colleges |
NA |
40 |
Member, selection committee for appointment of professors, associate professors and assistant professors in:
- Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India
- Bharadhidasan University, Tiruchirappalli, Tamil Nadu, India
- Bharathiar University, Coimbatore, Tamil Nadu, India
- Alagappa University, Karaikudi, Tamil Nadu, India
- University of Madras, Chennai, Tamil Nadu, India
- Anna University, Chennai, Tamil Nadu, India and several other Universities and Colleges
|
NA |
41 |
University nominee to governing body, administarive council, board of studies, managing commitee, finance committee, award committee, planning and evaluation commitee for:
- Madurai Kamaraj University College, Madurai
- Madura College, Madurai
- N.M.S.S.V.N. College, Madurai
- Lady Doak College, Madurai
- Sri Meenakshi College for Women, Madurai
- Kodaikanal Christian College, Kodaikanal
|
NA |
42 |
Member, Senate, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India |
NA |
42 |
Member, Academic Council, Madurai Kamaraj University, Madurai, Tamil Nadu, India |
NA |